Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/09/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/09/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/03/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/03/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/19/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 01/29/2014