Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/15/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 01/15/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/23/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/23/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/26/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 02/26/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/26/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/07/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/13/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/17/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/10/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/22/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/08/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/17/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/09/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/11/2014