Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/15/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/18/2013