Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 03/25/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 03/25/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/25/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/25/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 03/25/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/13/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/22/2013