Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/14/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/14/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/14/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/14/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 01/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/15/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/15/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/15/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/22/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/22/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/22/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/22/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/25/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 01/25/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/25/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/25/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/25/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/25/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/05/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/05/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/05/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/05/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/05/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/28/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/04/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/15/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/11/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/11/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/11/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/26/2014