Refine your search

14 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
09/18/2013 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
09/17/2013-4:39pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5556-5557)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
09/17/2013-4:02pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1410.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
09/17/2013-4:02pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5556-5562)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
09/17/2013-4:02pm House Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
09/17/2013 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 154.
Type of Action: Calendars
09/17/2013 House Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-210.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/24/2013 House Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 35 - 5.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/24/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/24/2013 House Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
05/16/2013 House Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs
04/15/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
04/09/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
04/09/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral