Text: H.R.1410 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (09/18/2013)


113th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 1410

IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
September 18, 2013

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs


AN ACT

To prohibit gaming activities on certain Indian lands in Arizona until the expiration of certain gaming compacts.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Keep the Promise Act of 2013”.

SEC. 2. Findings.

The Congress finds as follows:

(1) In 2002, the voters in the State of Arizona approved Proposition 202, the Indian Gaming Preservation and Self-Reliance Act.

(2) To obtain the support of Arizona voters to approve Proposition 202, the Indian tribes within Arizona agreed to limit the number of casinos within the State and in particular within the Phoenix metropolitan area.

(3) This Act preserves the agreement made between the tribes and the Arizona voters until the expiration of the gaming compacts authorized by Proposition 202.

SEC. 3. Definitions.

For the purposes of this Act—

(1) the terms “Indian tribe”, “class II gaming”, and “class III gaming” have the meanings given those terms in section 4 of the Indian Gaming Regulatory Act (25 U.S.C. 2703); and

(2) the term “Phoenix metropolitan area” means land within Maricopa County and Pinal County, Arizona, that is north of latitude 33 degrees, 5 minutes, 13 seconds north, east of longitude 113 degrees, 20 minutes, 0 seconds west, and west of longitude 110 degrees, 50 minutes, 45 seconds west, using the NED 1983 State Plane Arizona FOPS 0202 coordinate system.

SEC. 4. Gaming clarification.

(a) Prohibition.—Class II gaming and class III gaming are prohibited on land within the Phoenix metropolitan area acquired by the Secretary of the Interior in trust for the benefit of an Indian tribe after April 9, 2013.

(b) Expiration.—The prohibition in subsection (a) shall expire on January 1, 2027.

Passed the House of Representatives September 17, 2013.

Attest: karen l. haas,   
Clerk