Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/18/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/25/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/07/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/07/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/13/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/17/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/05/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/19/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/01/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/01/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/01/2014