Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 04/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/09/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 04/09/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/11/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/11/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/15/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/15/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/15/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/18/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/18/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/18/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/23/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/25/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/25/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/06/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/06/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/09/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/09/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 05/09/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/14/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/04/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/12/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 06/25/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 07/09/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/25/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/25/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/15/2014