Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 04/15/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/15/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 04/17/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/03/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/07/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/05/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/11/2013
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/20/2014