Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/17/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/03/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/12/2014