Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/17/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/07/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 05/23/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/09/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/28/2014