Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/17/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 05/03/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/10/2013