Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/26/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/04/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/24/2013