Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/15/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/15/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/17/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/17/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/19/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/03/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/07/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/13/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/05/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/10/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/10/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/30/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/09/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/28/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/12/2014