Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/11/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/12/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/15/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/18/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/24/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/24/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/24/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/26/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/03/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/14/2013