Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/11/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/11/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/24/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/24/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/25/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/22/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/09/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 07/09/2014