There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

EPA Science Advisory Board Reform Act of 2014

Short Titles as Reported to House

EPA Science Advisory Board Reform Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

EPA Science Advisory Board Reform Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Environmental Research, Development, and Demonstration Authorization Act of 1978 to provide for Scientific Advisory Board member qualifications, public participation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/18/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 229 - 191 (Roll no. 525).
07/22/2013 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 113-165.
04/09/2013 Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
11/19/2014 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
11/18/2014-6:02pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/18/2014-6:02pm House On passage Passed by recorded vote: 229 - 191 (Roll no. 525).
11/18/2014-5:53pm House On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 195 - 225 (Roll no. 524).
11/18/2014-5:45pm House The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H8062)
11/18/2014-5:37pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Sean Maloney motion to recommit with instructions, pending reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to prohibit people from serving on the Science Advisory Board if they represent a corporation or a trade association with a financial interest in the outcome of the Boards decisions. The reservation of the point of order was subsequently withdrawn.
11/18/2014-5:37pm House Mr. Maloney, Sean moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. (consideration: CR H8062-8063; text: H8062)
11/18/2014-5:35pm House H.Amdt.1145 On agreeing to the Stewart amendment (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 232 - 184 (Roll no. 523).
11/18/2014-5:07pm House H.Amdt.1145 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) without objection. (consideration: CR H8061)
11/18/2014-5:02pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 756, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Stewart Part A amendment No. 1.
11/18/2014-5:02pm House H.Amdt.1145 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Stewart. (consideration: CR H8060-8062; text: CR H8060)
11/18/2014-5:01pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8060-8064)
11/18/2014-2:29pm House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair announced that pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, further proceedings on H.R. 1422 had been postponed.
11/18/2014-1:37pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1422.
11/18/2014-1:35pm House Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1422, H.R. 4012 and H.R. 4795. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1422, H.R. 4012, and H.R. 4795. General debate is limited to 1 hour for each bill. The resolution specifies certain amendments are in order for H.R. 1422, H.R. 4012, and H.R. 4795. One motion to recommit with instructions is permitted for each bill.
11/18/2014-1:35pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 756. (consideration: CR H8050-8064; text of measure as reported in the House: CR H8050-8051)
11/17/2014-7:26pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 756 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1422, H.R. 4012 and H.R. 4795. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1422, H.R. 4012, and H.R. 4795. General debate is limited to 1 hour for each bill. The resolution specifies certain amendments are in order for H.R. 1422, H.R. 4012, and H.R. 4795. One motion to recommit with instructions is permitted for each bill.
07/22/2013 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 119.
07/22/2013 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 113-165.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
04/11/2013 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 16.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
04/11/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
04/09/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
04/09/2013 House Introduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology04/09/2013 Referred to
04/11/2013 Markup by
07/22/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-165
Senate Environment and Public Works11/19/2014 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (7)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Advisory bodies
  • Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
  • Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
  • Environmental regulatory procedures
  • Research administration and funding

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1422. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/18/2014)

EPA Science Advisory Board Reform Act of 2014 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Environmental Research, Development, and Demonstration Authorization Act of 1978 to revise requirements for the Science Advisory Board, which gives scientific advice to the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA), and address public disclosure of scientific and technical information that the EPA uses as a basis for agency actions.

Emphasizes that the Board provides such advice independently.

Revises the process of selecting members of the Board. Requires at least 10% of Board membership to represent state, local, or tribal governments. Excludes from membership any federally registered lobbyists.

Directs the Board to ensure that:

  • the points of view represented on the Board are fairly balanced among the members,
  • persons with substantial and relevant expertise are not excluded from the Board because of affiliation with or representation of entities that might have a potential interest in the Board's advisory activities, and
  • members do not participate in advisory activities that involve review or application of their own work.

Revises Board terms of office.

Revises the procedures for providing advice and comments to the EPA by: (1) including draft risk or hazard assessments in the regulatory proposals and documents made available to the Board, and (2) requiring advice and comments to be included in the record regarding any such proposal and published in the Federal Register.

Revises the operation of Board member committees and investigative panels to: (1) require that they operate in accordance with the membership, participation, and policy requirements (including new requirements for public participation in advisory activities of the Board) contained in this Act; (2) deny them authority to make decisions on behalf of the Board; and (3) prohibit direct reporting to EPA.

Revises requirements for public participation and transparency. Requires the EPA and the Board to make all reports and relevant scientific information available to the public concurrently when that information is made available to the Board.

Adds guidelines for the conduct of Board advisory activities, including: (1) avoidance of making policy determinations or recommendations, (2) communication of uncertainties, (3) dissenting members' views, and (4) periodic reviews to ensure that such activities address the most important scientific issues affecting EPA.

(Sec. 3) Prohibits this Act from being construed as supplanting the requirements of the Federal Advisory Committee Act or the Ethics in Government Act of 1978.