Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/27/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/14/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 01/14/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/15/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/17/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/04/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 02/11/2014