Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/23/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/23/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/26/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/30/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/11/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/11/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/24/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/23/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/03/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 10/09/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/16/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/23/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 11/12/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/12/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 11/12/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 11/12/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 11/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/11/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/28/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/06/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/06/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/06/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/09/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/17/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/08/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/11/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 09/15/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/11/2014