There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Air Traffic Control Tower Funding Restoration Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Consolidated and Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2013, to modify the amounts appropriated for the Federal Aviation Administration, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/09/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/09/2013Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/09/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/16/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/16/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/16/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/16/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/16/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/16/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/16/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/16/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/16/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/16/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/18/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/18/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/18/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/18/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/24/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/24/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/24/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/24/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/24/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/26/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 04/26/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/26/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/26/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/06/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations04/09/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1432.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1432. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/09/2013)

Air Traffic Control Tower Funding Restoration Act - Amends the Consolidated and Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2013 to increase funding to the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) for air traffic organization activities. Allocates certain appropriations for contract tower program for contract towers in operation as of February 1, 2013.

Specifies offsetting rescissions from FY2013 FAA appropriations for facilities and equipment and for research, engineering, and development.