Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/09/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/10/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/10/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/10/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/10/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/11/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/11/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/12/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/16/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/16/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/16/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/16/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/16/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/16/2013