Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/08/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/16/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 06/27/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/22/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/20/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/30/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/10/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/18/2014