Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/25/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/25/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/25/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 04/25/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/25/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/25/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/25/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/06/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/08/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/08/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/08/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/08/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/08/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/14/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/21/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/06/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/23/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/23/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/23/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 09/17/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 11/19/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/19/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/19/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 12/03/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/03/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/03/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/03/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 12/03/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 12/03/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 12/03/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/03/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/30/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/30/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/30/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/30/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/30/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/30/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/30/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/01/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/01/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/01/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/01/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/01/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/06/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/07/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/07/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/08/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/20/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/02/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 06/10/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/08/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/17/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/28/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/30/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 09/16/2014