Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/22/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/22/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/22/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/04/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/04/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/05/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/06/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/11/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/25/2013