Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 04/10/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/07/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/07/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/07/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/13/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/16/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/16/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/23/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/28/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 09/12/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 10/07/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/16/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/23/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/12/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 01/29/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/27/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/05/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/05/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 03/25/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/10/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 05/01/2014
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/01/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/08/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/08/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/08/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/13/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/30/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/11/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/19/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 06/19/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/08/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/14/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/15/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/24/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/30/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/31/2014