Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 04/10/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/15/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/17/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/10/2014