Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/08/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/08/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/08/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/28/2014