Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/15/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/15/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/15/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/15/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/17/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/17/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/17/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/17/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/25/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/17/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/03/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/17/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/17/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/17/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/18/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/18/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/26/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/18/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/27/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/16/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 01/14/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/14/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/01/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/09/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/26/2014