There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Death Tax Repeal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal the Federal estate and gift taxes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/03/2013Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/08/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/08/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/08/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/08/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/08/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/13/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 03/07/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/07/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 03/19/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/10/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/23/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/22/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/03/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.147. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2013)

Death Tax Repeal Act - Repeals the federal estate, gift, and generation-skipping transfer taxes.