Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/26/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/31/2013