Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 01/14/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/15/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/15/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/15/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/18/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/18/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 01/18/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/18/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/18/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/22/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/22/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/22/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/22/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/22/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/23/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/23/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/25/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/25/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 02/01/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/06/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/13/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/24/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/04/2014