There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to provide certain funds to eligible entities for activities undertaken to address the marine debris impacts of the March 2011 Tohoku earthquake and subsequent tsunami, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/02/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-399, Part I.
04/11/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
04/02/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-399, Part I.
12/04/2013Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/04/2013Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/04/2013Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged.
06/13/2013Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs
04/18/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/12/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/11/2013Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2013Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (19)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/11/2013 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation04/12/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources04/11/2013 Referred to
12/04/2013 Markup by
04/02/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-399
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs04/18/2013 Referred to
06/13/2013 Hearings by
12/04/2013 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1491. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (04/02/2014)

Authorizes the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to provide funds to any state, local, or tribal government impacted by the events, including marine debris, resulting from the March 2011 earthquake and subsequent tsunami in the Tohoku region of Japan (such events are defined collectively as a "covered severe marine debris event"). Provides for such funds to assist with the costs of any activity carried out to address the effects of such event.

Permits the Administrator to provide such funds using any funds provided by the government of Japan for such purposes.