Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/16/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/07/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/12/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/16/2013