Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 04/11/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/17/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/17/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 04/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/08/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/22/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/14/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/19/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/08/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/09/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/03/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/18/2014