Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 04/16/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/17/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/19/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/23/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/25/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/25/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/08/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 05/08/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/16/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/16/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/16/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/23/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/17/2013