Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/04/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/04/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 10/04/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/04/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 10/08/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 10/08/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 10/11/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 10/15/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/28/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 10/30/2013