Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 10/08/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/29/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/10/2014