Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/14/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 01/31/2014