Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/11/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 04/11/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/24/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/22/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/22/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 11/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/04/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/17/2014