Refine your search

Showing 16 of 16 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
07/23/2014 Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
04/29/2014 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
04/28/2014-5:51pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3218)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014-5:42pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1501.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014-5:42pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3218-3219)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014-5:42pm House Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/01/2014 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 291.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
04/01/2014 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-392.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
03/13/2014 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
03/13/2014 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
03/13/2014 House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
02/26/2014 House Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation
04/19/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
04/11/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives