There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Prison Ship Martyrs' Monument Preservation Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Prison Ship Martyrs' Monument Preservation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Prison Ship Martyrs' Monument Preservation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to study the suitability and feasibility of designating the Prison Ship Martyrs' Monument in Fort Greene Park, in the New York City borough of Brooklyn, as a unit of the National Park System.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/28/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3218)
04/01/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-392.
04/11/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
07/23/2014SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
04/29/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
04/28/2014-5:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3218)
04/28/2014-5:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1501.
04/28/2014-5:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3218-3219)
04/28/2014-5:42pmHouseMr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/01/2014HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 291.
04/01/2014HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-392.
03/13/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
03/13/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/13/2014HouseSubcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
02/26/2014HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation
04/19/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/11/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
04/11/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/11/2013 Referred to
03/13/2014 Markup by
04/01/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-392
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation04/19/2013 Referred to
02/26/2014 Hearings by
03/13/2014 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources04/29/2014 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks07/23/2014 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1501. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/28/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on April 1, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Prison Ship Martyrs' Monument Preservation Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to study the suitability and feasibility of designating the Prison Ship Martyr's Monument in Fort Greene Park in the New York City borough of Brooklyn as a unit of the National Park System (NPS).

Requires the study to include: (1) an analysis of operational issues that should be considered if the Monument were to be designated as an NPS unit; (2) an analysis of the feasibility of administering the Monument, considering its size, configuration, and other factors including an annual cost estimate; (3) an analysis of the economic, educational, and other impacts of the designation of the Monument as an NPS unit; (4) an analysis of the effect of such designation on existing commercial and recreational activities, and on the authorization, construction, operation, maintenance, or improvement of energy production and transmission infrastructure, and the authority of state and local governments to manage those activities; and (5) an identification of any authorities, including condemnation, that will compel or permit the Secretary to influence or participate in local land use decisions (such as zoning) or place restrictions on non-federal lands if the Monument is designated as an NPS unit.

Requires, upon commencement of the study, owners of private property in or adjacent to the Monument to be notified of the study's commencement and scope.