There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Security Disability Insurance and Unemployment Benefits Double Dip Elimination Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title II of the Social Security Act to prevent concurrent receipt of unemployment benefits and Social Security disability insurance, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/11/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/03/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/11/2013Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E432)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/15/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/16/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/17/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/26/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/26/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/26/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/26/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/26/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/09/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/27/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/03/2014
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/22/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/22/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/22/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/22/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/22/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 05/22/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/22/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/22/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/22/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/11/2013 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security06/03/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1502. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/11/2013)

Social Security Disability Insurance and Unemployment Benefits Double Dip Elimination Act - Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act to declare that for any month that an individual is entitled to unemployment compensation he or she shall be deemed to have engaged in substantial gainful activity and so be disqualified from receiving Social Security disability benefits after a certain period has elapsed.

States that, for purposes of determining services rendered by an individual during a period of trial work which will not disqualify the individual for disability benefits, the individual shall be deemed to have rendered services in a month if he or she is entitled to unemployment compensation or trade adjustment assistance for that month.