Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/16/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/17/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/07/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/27/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/22/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/22/2014