Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/11/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/15/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/05/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/05/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/23/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/28/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/24/2014