Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/22/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/22/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/22/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/22/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 02/26/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/12/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/12/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/21/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/15/2014