Refine your search

Refined by:

Arizona Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/16/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/08/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/15/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/15/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/23/2014