Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/23/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 04/24/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/09/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/14/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/14/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/14/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/14/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/14/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/14/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/14/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/15/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/20/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/03/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/10/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/08/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/18/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/22/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/26/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 09/26/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/07/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/10/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/11/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/22/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/24/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/14/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/12/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/09/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 01/13/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 06/17/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/18/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/24/2014