Refine your search

Refined by:

Colorado Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/16/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/10/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/12/2013