Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/25/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/09/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/13/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/10/2014